+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2231ER)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 973580180
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor