+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 10, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1034)
On May 7, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1034 (effective 7/1/99)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: ADOPTION (37-Y 61-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (37-Y 61-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2230ER)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 993492828
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (37-Y 61-N)
February 16, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor