+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 354 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2228ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (18-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 13103575D
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor