+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (97-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 079433536-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 079433536-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 076309536