+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0928)
On March 23, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 928 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2222ER)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 030756814-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 030756814
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2003: Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2003: Reported from M., P. & P. S. with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor