+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2222ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15103583D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2222E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 15103583D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2015: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor