+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 124 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2220ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11100524D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2220E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #1
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100524D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor