+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 498 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB222ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (80-Y 19-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (80-Y 19-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB222H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105070D-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105070D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #4
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102071D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (80-Y 19-N)
March 2, 2010: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
February 9, 2010: Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
February 4, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor