+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 41 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2217ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Local Government
- Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101389D
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor