+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0423)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 423 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2213ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (56-Y 43-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 16-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2213H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104164D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 21104164D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102931D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
February 18, 2021: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N)
February 16, 2021: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 16-N)
February 15, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2021: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2021: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
February 3, 2021: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
February 2, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
January 22, 2021: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor