+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
- Enacted, Chapter 759 (effective 7/1/13)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2211ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2211ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (3-Y 94-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N)
- House acceded to request
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Reeves, Garrett, Marsh
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: McClellan, Sherwood, Scott, E.T.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2211H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104622D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 13104622D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 13103602D