+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 158 (effective 3/16/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2211ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 093274584-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2211EH1
- Amendments by Delegate Jones agreed to
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to 093274584-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 093274584-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 094056820
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor