+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2210ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 999723805-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from M. & M. R. with amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Mining and Mineral Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 999723805
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1999: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: Reported from M. & M. R. with amds. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor