+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 162 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB221ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB221H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 081490588-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 081490588-H1
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On December 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081073588
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2008: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor