+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 300 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2202ER)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 018360608-H1
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 018360608-H1
- Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 018178408-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 018178408-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate sub. rejected by House 018178408-S1 (1-Y 94-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 94-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Almand, Purkey, McClure
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Hawkins, Stosch, Saslaw
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 018178408-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 010750608-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds (23-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 010750608
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 94-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2001: Reported from Finance with amds (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor