+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 223 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2200ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 010751608
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor