+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB220ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 5-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N)
- Read third time and passed House (78-Y 20-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 16102347D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB220E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 5-N)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102347D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
March 2, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 5-N)
February 1, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N)
January 26, 2016: Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 5-N)
January 21, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor