+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (35)
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 7/1/95)
On January 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On January 17, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB220ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD2997156-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD2997156-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On January 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On December 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Substitute bill reprinted LD2997156-S1
On December 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Substitute bill reprinted LD2997156-S1
On November 28, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed Bill reprinted LD2915845-E
On November 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD2997156-S1
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1995 in Commerce and Labor (8-Y 6-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD2915845-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amds. (18-Y 2-N)
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed LD2915845
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
January 17, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
January 13, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 1-N)
November 10, 1994: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
March 8, 1994: Continued to 1995 in Commerce and Labor (8-Y 6-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from C. I. B. w/amds. (18-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor