+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 50 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 29, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/22/16
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB22ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 28-N)
- Read third time and passed House (68-Y 28-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 7-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100187D