+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13104293D-H1
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Standards Of Quality
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 13103013D
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2013: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor