+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 14, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1003)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov. recomm. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1003 (effective 7/1/99)
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2196ER2)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2196ER)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read second time
- Amendments by Mr. McDonnell agreed to
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 996503350-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 996503350
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor