+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- No action taken by General Laws by voice vote
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Rereferred to General Laws
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD7706432
+ − Vote
February 2, 1995: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor