+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2187H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103241D-H1
- Read second time
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 21103241D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102677D