+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102706D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N)
January 23, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor