+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
On March 20, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2186ER)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 973526358-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 973526358
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1997: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1997: Reported from Tra. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor