+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 8, 1997 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (35-Y 58-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (35-Y 58-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2185ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Amendment by Sen. Reynolds agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 11-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (66-Y 30-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 30-N)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (7-Y 4-N 2-A)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 39-N)
- Read third time and passed House (60-Y 39-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (17-Y 5-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 973606300
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (35-Y 58-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 30-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 11-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: Reported from R. & S. S. (7-Y 4-N 2-A)
January 28, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 39-N)
January 23, 1997: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor