+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective 3/18/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2182ER)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg. clause pref.01/08/03 036795211
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2003: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor