+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2182ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2182H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105964D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 19105964D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103915D