+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0038)
On March 2, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 38 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2181ER)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 979007825-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 979007825
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1997: Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1997: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor