+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 34 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2180ER)
- Enrolled
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 5-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102237D