+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB218ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB218H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104514D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Incorporates HB26
- Committee substitute printed 14104514D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On December 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100803D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor