+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 139 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2179ER)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 031789253-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 031789253
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2003: Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor