+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 20, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 489 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2178ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed House (85-Y 12-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 970035445-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 970035445
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 28, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N)
January 23, 1997: Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor