+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 8, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 58 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2177ER)
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 013980632-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amd (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 013980632