+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2177ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 072640222-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2177E
- Amendment by Delegate BaCote agreed to
- Read second time
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072640222
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2007: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2007: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor