+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2177ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 034592816-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 034592816
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N)
January 24, 2003: Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor