+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2176ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103080D