+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
On March 13, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2173ER)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 018430648-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 018430648-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 018430648-S1
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsider motion to pass by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (97-Y 1-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (24-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 011456648