+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 488 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2171ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102674D
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor