+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 147 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2170ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101618D