+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0806)
- Enacted, Chapter 806 (effective 7/1/09)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2169ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (91-Y 8-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (91-Y 8-N)
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2169ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (82-Y 8-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 093647400-S1 (82-Y 8-N)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 093647400-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2169S1
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 093647400-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute rejected 093606400-H1
- Read second time
- Substitute by Delegate Abbitt agreed to 093639400-H2
- Floor substitute printed 093639400-H2 (Abbitt)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2169H2
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 093606400-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 8-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: 2
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093819536
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 8, 2009: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 8, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (91-Y 8-N)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (82-Y 8-N)
February 24, 2009: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 4-N)
February 23, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor