+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2169ER)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 016113868-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 016113868