+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 363 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2165ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2165H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 093122604-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 093122604-H1
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: 2
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093104604