+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 64 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2164ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11103409D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2164E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #4
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103409D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor