+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 374 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2164ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2164H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104835D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104835D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102484D
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2015: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor