+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 3/18/11)
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2162ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11101394D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2162E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/12/11 11101394D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor