+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Enacted, Chapter 834 (effective 7/1/06)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB216ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 061043129-H1
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB216ER)
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB216S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 061037524-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 061037524-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 064142524
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2006: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor