+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Judiciary (6-Y 7-N)
- Committee amendments
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2155H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103989D-H1
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 21103989D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102802D