+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 29 (effective 1/1/13)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2155ER)
- Enrolled
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13103456D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2155E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103456D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 7, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor