+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2151ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
- Amendments by Senator Northam rejected (18-Y 22-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N)
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 14-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2151H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104176D-H1
- Read second time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104176D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103687D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 11, 2013: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
February 11, 2013: Amendments by Senator Northam rejected (18-Y 22-N)
February 8, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 2-N)
January 24, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N)
January 21, 2013: Reported from Education with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor